Global Patent Index - EP 1080480 A1

EP 1080480 A1 2001-03-07 - OVERCURRENT TRIP FOR ELECTRIC PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICES

Title (en)

OVERCURRENT TRIP FOR ELECTRIC PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICES

Title (de)

ÜBERSTROMAUSLÖSER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE SCHUTZSCHALTGERÄTE

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR ANTI-SURTENSION POUR APPAREILS COMMUTATEURS DE SECURITE ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1080480 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934483 A

Priority

  • DE 9901431 W
  • DE 19822992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822992A1] An overcurrent release in which both a bimetallic, thermal release or trip is heated, and the magnetic circuit of a magnetic release or trip is energised. The thermal release includes a slotted (3) sleeve (2) made of a bimetallic material and positioned within the coil (1) through which it extends mainly in an axial direction. The limbs (5,6), between which is formed the slot (3), on heating are moved towards one another resulting in reduction of the slot width and initiation of the release or trip movement. The sleeve (2) has a shape specifically of a cylindrical envelope slotted mainly in an axial direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/40 (2013.01); H01H 2071/407 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962091A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822992 A1 19991125; EP 1080480 A1 20010307; EP 1080480 B1 20020403; TR 200001198 T2 20010122; WO 9962091 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901124

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-05-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901124 20020508

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000417