Global Patent Index - EP 1080513 A1

EP 1080513 A1 2001-03-07 - AUTOMOBILE ANTENNA DEVICE

Title (en)

AUTOMOBILE ANTENNA DEVICE

Title (de)

FAHRZEUG-ANTENNENEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ANTENNE POUR VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1080513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915696 A

Priority

  • DE 19823202 A
  • EP 9901980 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823202A1] The invention relates to an automobile antenna device having at least one antenna structure (5-10) mounted on the glass pane (3) of an automobile. The base point terminal connections of all antennas that are assembled in the contact points (11) of a contact field (4) are surrounded by a plastic mount (1) arranged on the glass pane (3) of an automobile in which a high frequency device (2) can be removably fixed, whose connection terminals are connected to contact points (11) without using any connecting lines. One advantage provided by the removable arrangement of the high frequency device (2) on the glass pane (3) of the automobile is that no tolerances need to be compensated for between the glass pane (3) of the automobile and the body. Said arrangement also makes it possible to remove the high frequency device (2) in a simple and cost-effective manner for repair purposes or to replace it with another high frequency device without having to change the glass pane (3) of the automobile. One particular advantage is that when the contact elements of the high frequency device (2), which are embodied as contact springs (12), directly contact the matching contact points (11) in the contact field (4) after they have been inserted in the mount (1), said elements also contribute to fixing the high frequency device (2) in the mount in view of their elastic effect since the noses (36-39) of the high frequency device (2) are pressed against the projecting parts (28-31) of the mount (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01); H01Q 23/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962136A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823202 A1 19991209; DE 19823202 C2 20030528; CZ 20002668 A3 20001213; CZ 295126 B6 20050518; EP 1080513 A1 20010307; EP 1080513 B1 20021113; EP 1080513 B2 20090107; ES 2186346 T3 20030501; JP 2002517114 A 20020611; JP 3408244 B2 20030519; US 6411259 B1 20020625; WO 9962136 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HIRSCHMANN CAR COMMUNICATION GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120803

2012-09-07 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20120803

2012-09-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HIRSCHMANN CAR COMMUNICATION GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120803

2012-09-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120809 AND 20120815

2012-04-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HIRSCHMANN CAR COMMUNICATION GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59903407

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120306

2012-04-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59903407

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120306

2012-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59903407

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060324

2009-01-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-03-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2005-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH & CO.KG TECCENTER

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186346

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903407

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000711

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE