Global Patent Index - EP 1080655 A2

EP 1080655 A2 2001-03-07 - Magnetic fasteners

Title (en)

Magnetic fasteners

Title (de)

Magnetischer Verschluss

Title (fr)

Fermoir magnétique

Publication

EP 1080655 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307518 A

Priority

  • JP 25040099 A
  • JP 2000021099 A
  • JP 2000185786 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a magnetic fixing unit which enforces strength of an assembly and prevents a mutual shifting in between a first and a second assemblies. The first assembly comprises an engaging mean, on the other hand, the second assembly comprises a guide mean. When the first and the second assemblies are combined with each other, said engaging mean may be led an inside of said guide mean. A combination of said assemblies may be automatically locked due to magnetism of magnet applied to an engaging member which is formed on said second assembly. Further, a rim-shaped guide mean which covers a side of an attracting surface of the other assembly from outside is formed on the side of said attracting surface of either of said assemblies. Further, an extending guide portion is formed on said engaging mean of said first assembly, by being said extending guide portion combined with a hole of said second assembly, a vertical mutual shifting of said first and said second assemblies will be prevented as well. Further, by being formed a gap member in between said <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/10; A44B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41F 1/00 (2006.01); A44B 17/00 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41F 1/002 (2013.01); A45C 13/1069 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080655 A2 20010307; EP 1080655 A3 20021016; CN 1171550 C 20041020; CN 1286951 A 20010314; JP 2001286321 A 20011016; JP 3548503 B2 20040728; KR 100406013 B1 20031119; KR 20010030079 A 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45C 13/10 A, 7A 44B 17/00 B, 7A 41F 1/00 B, 7H 01F 7/02 B

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI