Global Patent Index - EP 1080666 A1

EP 1080666 A1 2001-03-07 - Clamping connector for desk tops

Title (en)

Clamping connector for desk tops

Title (de)

Klemmverbinder für Schreibtischplatten

Title (fr)

Raccord par serrage pour plateaux de bureau

Publication

EP 1080666 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107628 A

Priority

DE 19941749 A

Abstract (en)

The connector for attaching a desk top to a base comprises a first section (1) which is attached to the desk top and a second section (2) which is attached to the base. The connector is assembled by sliding the two sections together in a direction (II) parallel to the top. A hinged component (16) on the second section has a hook (18) at the front which engages a bar (9) on the first section to lock the fastener.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Tischplattenbefestigungsvorrichtung mit einem plattenseitigen ersten Verschlußteil 1 und einem sockelseitigen zweiten Verschlußteil 2, wobei das erste und das zweite Verschlußteil 1,2 in einer Montagerichtung I parallel zu der Tischplatte 21 zusammenschiebbar sind und im zusammengeschobenen Zustand in einer senkrecht zu der Tischplatte 21 orientierten Richtung einen Formschluß bilden, sowie mit einem Verriegelungselement 16, das an einem Verschlußteil 2 verlagerbar befestigt ist und das im zusammengeschobenen Zustand der Befestigungsvorrichtung in eine Verschlußstellung verlagerbar ist, in der eine Hinterschneidung 9 des anderen Verschlußteils 1 in einer Richtung I parallel zu der Tischplatte 21 formschlüssig hintergriffen ist. Auf diese Weise wird eine einfach lösbare und zuverlässige Verbindung zwischen Tischplatte und Sockel geschaffen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 13/00; E05C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080666 A1 20010307; DE 19941749 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMAS DEUTSCHLAND AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI