Global Patent Index - EP 1080667 A3

EP 1080667 A3 2002-09-25 - An arrangement in a table

Title (en)

An arrangement in a table

Title (de)

Anordnung an einem Tisch

Title (fr)

Agencement à une table

Publication

EP 1080667 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00202398 A

Priority

SE 9902845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1080667A2] An undercarriage (1) for a table comprises at least two elongate profile elements (5) and a plurality of leg anchorages (3). The profile elements (5) include at least one longitudinal undercut groove (11). Each one of the leg anchorages (3) includes a rotary engagement member (9) for engagement in the undercut groove (11). Further, each one of the leg anchorages (3) includes at least one guide member (10) for guiding the leg anchorage (3) in the undercut groove (11) and for absorbing transversely directed forces. The rotary engagement member (9) is operable via an operating device (12) which is disposed inside the side surface of the leg anchorage (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080667 A2 20010307; EP 1080667 A3 20020925; SE 9902845 D0 19990806; SE 9902845 L 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI