Global Patent Index - EP 1080668 A1

EP 1080668 A1 2001-03-07 - Mounting for a corner cupboard

Title (en)

Mounting for a corner cupboard

Title (de)

Beschlag für einen Eckschrank

Title (fr)

Montage pour un placard de coin

Publication

EP 1080668 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116923 A

Priority

DE 19941537 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting for use in a corner cupboard has upper and lower arms (18, 19) attached to the cupboard door. These are normally mounted at right angles to a column (58), but are on pivots (32, 33) so that they can be moved up to lie against it, forming a flat unit for transport.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag für einen Eckschrank zum Halten von Fachböden (6) enthält eine drehbar im Eckschrank zu lagernde Drehsäule (3), an der eine obere und eine untere Trageinrichtung (18,19) für die Eckschranktüre in Längsrichtung der Drehsäule (3) mit Abstand zueinander angeordnet sind. Die Trageinrichtungen (18,19) sind jeweils um eine quer zur Drehsäule (3) gerichtete Schwenkachse (32,33) schwenkbar mit der Drehsäule verbunden, so daß die Trageinrichtungen (18,19) aus ihrer von der Drehsäule (3) abstehenden Gebrauchslage in eine Transportlage verschwenkbar sind, in der der Beschlag eine mit Bezug auf die Gebrauchslage flachere Gestalt aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0317737 B1 19911204

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080668 A1 20010307; EP 1080668 B1 20030528; AT 241294 T 20030615; DE 19941537 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002336 P 20030703

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI