Global Patent Index - EP 1080670 A1

EP 1080670 A1 2001-03-07 - Mounting device for shelves and shelf assembly

Title (en)

Mounting device for shelves and shelf assembly

Title (de)

Zusammenbauvorrichtung für Regale und Regalanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage pour rayonnages et arrangement de rayonnage

Publication

EP 1080670 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830547 A

Priority

EP 99830547 A

Abstract (en)

A mounting device (100; 1) for shelves (50), suitable for being attached to a wall or to a wall fastening element (3) anchored to a wall or partition, comprising an upper retaining fin (105; 5) and a lower retaining fin (108; 8), both projecting horizontally therefrom and at least one of said projecting fins forming a horizontal plane distanced vertically from the other fin by a distance such as to allow the insertion of a shelf (50), so that the shelf (50) is arranged horizontally between the upper and lower retaining fins (5, 8) and a cap (160), suitable for being attached to a retaining fin (105) so that its edges abut against the surface of said shelf (50), allowing its correct positioning. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/063 (2013.01); A47B 96/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080670 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLENO FELICE S.R.I.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI