Global Patent Index - EP 1080673 A2

EP 1080673 A2 2001-03-07 - Drinking receptacle

Title (en)

Drinking receptacle

Title (de)

Trinkgefäss

Title (fr)

Récipient à boire

Publication

EP 1080673 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118777 A

Priority

DE 29915432 U

Abstract (en)

The container or glass (10) has a drinking region (11) in which drink is provided when the glass is held in a drinking position. The glass has an inner element (20) with a smelling region (21) which can hold a portion of the drink. The smelling region is designed so as to enable the user to smell the drink while the glass is in the drinking position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Trinkgefäß (10) mit einem Trinkbereich (11), wobei in einer Trinkstellung des Trinkgefäßes (10) zumindest in dem Trinkbereich (11) Flüssigkeit zum Trinken zur Verfügung stellbar ist. Der Erfindung liegt daher die Aufgabe zugrunde, ein Trinkgefäß anzugeben, daß beim Verkosten einer Flüssigkeit auch unmittelbar vor, während bzw. nach dem Trinken ein möglich intensives Geruchserlebnis gestattet. Zur Lösung der Aufgabe weist das Trinkgefäß (10) ein Innenelement (20) mit einem Riechbereich (21) zur Aufnahme von Flüssigkeit auf, das derart aufgebaut und angeordnet ist, daß in der Trinkstellung des Trinkgefäßes (10) in dem Riechbereich (21) des Innenelements (20) Flüssigkeit zum Riechen zur Verfügung stellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/2205 (2013.01); A47G 2400/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915432 U1 19991230; EP 1080673 A2 20010307; EP 1080673 A3 20040804; US 6502712 B1 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080301

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI