Global Patent Index - EP 1080750 A2

EP 1080750 A2 2001-03-07 - Locking device for snowboard-binding

Title (en)

Locking device for snowboard-binding

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für eine Snowboard-Bindung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage pour fixation de planche à neige

Publication

EP 1080750 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118631 A

Priority

DE 19941908 A

Abstract (en)

A carriage (2) is movably guided in the snowboard's lengthwise direction. The angle of the binding to the snowboard's lengthwise direction (L) is adjustable by means of an angle adjustment disc (1) pivot mounted on the carriage and fixed to the binding. A guide plate (5) is fixed to the snowboard and has detents (14) along it. A locking member operated by a control is mounted on the carriage and fits into the detents. The periphery of the angle adjustment disc has detents into which grips a further control-operated locking member mounted on the carriage.

Abstract (de)

Zur Befestigung der Bindung an einem Snowboard ist ein Schlitten (2) vorgesehen, der zur Einstellung der Position der Bindung in Snowboard-Längsrichtung (L) an einer am Snowboard befestigten Führungsplatte (5) verschiebbar geführt ist. An dem Schlitten (2) ist eine Winkeleinstellscheibe (1), an der die Bindung befestigt ist, zur Einstellung des Winkels der Bindung zur Snowboard-Längsrichtung (L) drehbar gelagert. Zur Fixierung der eingestellten Längsposition des Schlittens (2) sind entlang der Führungsplatte (5) Rasten (14) angeordnet, in die ein am Schlitten (2) gelagertes, mit einer Handhabe (18) betätigbares Sperrglied (17) eingreift. Ferner sind zur Fixierung des eingestellten Winkels der Winkeleinstellscheibe (1) am Umfang der Winkeleinstellscheibe (1) Rasten (22) angeordnet, in die ein weiteres am Schlitten (2) gelagertes, mit einer Handhabe (18) betätigbares Sperrglied (30) eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01); A63C 10/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01); A63C 10/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080750 A2 20010307; EP 1080750 A3 20021002; DE 19941908 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI