Global Patent Index - EP 1080769 A1

EP 1080769 A1 2001-03-07 - Hollow body consisting of a metal web and method of fabricating such a hollow body

Title (en)

Hollow body consisting of a metal web and method of fabricating such a hollow body

Title (de)

Hohlkörper aus einem Metallgewebe und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Hohlkörpers

Title (fr)

Corps creux réalisé à partir d' un tissu métallique et procédé de réalisation d'un tel corps creux

Publication

EP 1080769 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113844 A

Priority

DE 19938135 A

Abstract (en)

A metal band (6) welded to the weld seam (5) between the two edges (2,3) is wider than the seam (5) and has an elastic area and should be welded to the outside of the hollow body (4). The band forms an obtusely angled piece of sheet and has wings (7,8) both sides of the weld. Deformable elastic material (9,10) is placed between sheet (6) and fabric (3,4), this material to be applied to the fabric edges (2,3) before the sheet (6) is welded on.

Abstract (de)

Ein Metallgewebe (1) wird zur Herstellung eines Hohlkörpers (4) an zwei Randbereichen (2,3) verschweißt und erfindungsgemäß wird im Bereich der Schweißnaht (5) ein Metallband (6) aufgeschweißt, wobei die Breite der Schweißnaht (5) schmaler ist als die Breite des Metallbandes (6). Vorzugsweise wird zwischen dem Metallband (6) und dem Metallgewebe (1) ein elastisches Material (9,10) angeordnet, das Schwingungen des Hohlkörpers abfängt und für eine Schonung der Schweißnaht (5) sorgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 29/11; B21D 39/02; B21D 51/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/08 (2013.01); B21C 37/0803 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19938135 A1 20010222; DE 19938135 B4 20080904; EP 1080769 A1 20010307; EP 1080769 B1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-12-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GKD GEBR. KUFFERATH AG

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000957 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000957 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2002-02-27 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GKD GEBR. KUFFERATH GMBH & CO. KG

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE IT LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI