Global patent index - EP 1080786 A1

EP 1080786 A1 2001-03-07 - Method, device and system for fluidised-bed jet mill

Title (en)

Method, device and system for fluidised-bed jet mill

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Fliessbettstrahlmahlung, Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens und Anlage mit einer solchen Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé, dispositif et système pour broyeur à jet à lit fluidisé

Publication

EP 1080786 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117288 A

Priority

  • DE 19939897 A
  • DE 19943670 A

Abstract (en)

The pulverizing process involves breaking down particles in a fluidized bed by means of a fluid jet (6, 7). The application of centrifugal force to the particles in the region of the fluid jet or jets causes more energy to be used on the particles in the fluidized bed, particularly in the vicinity of the fluid jet entrance.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Fließbettstrahlmahlung, wobei in einem strömenden Fluid suspendierte Feststoffpartikel (Mahlgut) unter Verwendung von zumindest einem Fluidstrahl (6,7) in Partikel kleinerer Korngröße zerlegt werden, indem der zumindest eine Fluidstrahl veranlaßt wird, mit hoher Energie in das Fließbett einzudringen und einen Energieaustausch zwischen Partikeln des Fließbettes zu bewirken. Mittels einer Fliehkraft (18), die zusammen mit dem zumindest einen energiereichen Fluidstrahl zur Einwirkung auf die Partikel im Fließbett vor allem in der Nähe des Fluidstrahleintritts gebracht wird, wird das Zusammenwirken zwischen Partikeln und dem in das Fließbett mit hoher Energie eintretenden Fluidstrahl vor allem im Strahleintrittsbereich beeinflußt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/06 (2006.01); B02C 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/068 (2013.01); B02C 23/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080786 A1 20010307; EP 1080786 B1 20090610; DE 50015655 D1 20090723; ES 2327810 T3 20091104; JP 2001070826 A 20010321; JP 4801832 B2 20111026; US 6398139 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-11-04 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2327810

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-11-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2009-07-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-07-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2009-06-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061106

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI