Global Patent Index - EP 1080788 A1

EP 1080788 A1 2001-03-07 - Cooling zone of a painting installation and method for operating such a cooling zone

Title (en)

Cooling zone of a painting installation and method for operating such a cooling zone

Title (de)

Kühlzone einer Lackieranlage und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer solchen Kühlzone

Title (fr)

Zone de refroidissement d'une installation de peinture et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une telle installation

Publication

EP 1080788 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117605 A

Priority

DE 19941760 A

Abstract (en)

The cooling zone has a tunnel-shaped cabin (106) with bounding walls (114,118) extending between an entrance and exit for the painted object and nozzles (162) in the bounding for cooling air walls into the interior of the cabin. At least part of the bounding walls of the cooling zone cabin can be heated in the entrance region. An Independent claim is also included for a method of cooling a painted and dried object or vehicle in a cooling zone.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Kühlzone (100) einer mindestens eine Lackierkabine, einen beheizten Trockner zum Trocknen lackierter Gegenstände sowie eine dem Trockner in Durchlaufrichtung der Gegenstände nachgeordnete Kühlzone zum Abkühlen der lackierten und getrockneten Gegenstände (126) aufweisenden Lackieranlage, wobei die Kühlzone (100) eine tunnelartige Kühlzonenkabine (106) mit den Innenraum (120) der Kühlzonenkabine (106) begrenzenden Begrenzungswänden (114,118) umfaßt, welche sich zwischen einer Eintrittsöffnung (128) und einer Austrittsöffnung der Kühlzonenkabine (106) für die lackierten Gegenstände (126) erstrecken, und die Begrenzungswände der Kühlzonenkabine (106) in einem an die Eintrittsöffnung (128) angrenzenden Einlaufbereich (132) der Kühlzone (100) mit Düsen (162) zum Einblasen von Kühlluft in den Innenraum (120) der Kühlzonenkabine (106) versehen sind, zu schaffen, die eine rasche Abkühlung der lackierten Gegenstände (126) ermöglicht, ohne daß an diesen Gegenständen durch Lösemittelkondensat verursachte Lackschäden auftreten, wird vorgeschlagen, daß zumindest ein Teilbereich der Begrenzungswände der Kühlzonenkabine (106) in dem Einlaufbereich (132) der Kühlzone (100) beheizbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/12; F26B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 9/12 (2006.01); B05B 15/12 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/283 (2013.01); B05B 15/1207 (2013.01); B05B 15/1233 (2013.01); F26B 2210/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080788 A1 20010307; EP 1080788 B1 20050126; BR 0003977 A 20010403; DE 19941760 A1 20010322; ES 2232360 T3 20050601; KR 20010076185 A 20010811

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50009334

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-11-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50009334

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50009334

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110816

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110816

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110816

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2232360

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009334

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI