Global patent index - EP 1080792 A2

EP 1080792 A2 2001-03-07 - Nozzle for dispensing material from a storage can

Title (en)

Nozzle for dispensing material from a storage can

Title (de)

Ausgabetülle für eine Arbeitsmaterial-Vorratsdose

Title (fr)

Buse de distribution pour réservoir de produit

Publication

EP 1080792 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118742 A

Priority

  • DE 29915315 U
  • DE 29918094 U

Abstract (en)

The nozzle on the point side has a section(x) connected to the external thread accommodating the screw cap with a diameter variance with a ratio of 2 to 1 or more. The diameter variance is created by two truncated cone sections(I,II) with different flank angles. The truncated cone section with the larger flank angle has a smaller length than the truncated cone section with the smaller flank angle. The truncated cone section with the larger flank angle fits on the external thread. An Independent claim is included for a working material dosing device, which may be a cartridge(2), where the length of the discharge nozzle is more than three quarters the length of the cartridge

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Ausgabetülle (1) für eine Arbeitsmaterial-Vorratsdose, wie bspw. eine Kartusche (2), zur Ausgabe von Arbeitsmaterial (M) wie Fugendichtmittel oder Klebstoff, wobei die Ausgabetülle (1) eine insgesamt konische Formgebung, endend in einer Spitze (9), aufweist, weiter ein fußseitiges Innengewinde (6) und ein zur Halterung einer Abdeckkappe (10) dienendes Außengewinde (12) besitzt, und schlägt zur Erzielung einer gebrauchsvorteilhaften Ausgestaltung vor, daß sich spitzenseitig an das Außengewinde (12) ein Tüllenabschnitt (x) anschließt, der ein Durchmesserverhältnis von 2:1 oder mehr aufweist. So steht ein beträchtlicher Bereich für die Variation der Weite der Tüllenöffnung und somit Strangdicke zur Verfügung. Der Gewindeeingriff (11/12) bleibt dabei nutzbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/005; B65D 47/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00516 (2013.01); B05C 17/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080792 A2 20010307; EP 1080792 A3 20050119

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060304

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05C 17/005 A

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 47/12 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI