Global Patent Index - EP 1080800 A2

EP 1080800 A2 2001-03-07 - Method for flexibly rolling a metal strip

Title (en)

Method for flexibly rolling a metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum flexiblen Walzen eines Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le laminage flexible d'une bande métallique

Publication

EP 1080800 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116083 A

Priority

  • DE 19936522 A
  • DE 19951889 A
  • DE 19954425 A
  • DE 19962754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6336350B1] A method for the flexible rolling of a metallic band wherein, during the rolling procedure, the metallic strip is lead through a roll gap which is formed between two working rolls and which is set so that, over the length of the metallic strip, strip sections are obtained with different strip thickness. In order to prevent temperature-related deviations in the thickness and length profiles of the metallic strip, a compensation of the temperature influence effecting the metallic strip is carried out during rolling in order to prevent deviations from the theoretical thickness and/or the theoretical length of the individual strip sections at a default temperature of the metallic strip.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben und dargestellt ist ein Verfahren zum flexiblen Walzen eines Metallbandes, wobei das Metallband während des Walzprozesses geführt wird durch einen zwischen zwei Arbeitswalzen gebildeten und so einstellbaren Walzspalt, daß über die Länge des Metallbandes unterschiedliche Bandabschnitte mit unterschiedlicher Banddicke erzielt werden. Um temperaturbedingte Abweichungen im Dicken- und Längenprofil des Metallbandes zu vermeiden, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß eine Kompensation des auf das Metallband wirkenden Temperatureinflusses während des Walzens durchgeführt wird, um Abweichungen von der Solldicke und/oder Soll-änge der einzelnen Bandabschnitte bei vorgegebener Endtemperatur des Metallban-des zu vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/26; B21B 37/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/02 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/26 (2006.01); B21B 37/38 (2006.01); B21B 37/70 (2006.01); B21B 37/76 (2006.01); B21C 51/00 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/26 (2013.01); B21B 37/38 (2013.01); B21B 37/70 (2013.01); B21B 37/58 (2013.01); B21B 38/02 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0071 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6336350 B1 20020108; AT 286789 T 20050115; EP 1080800 A2 20010307; EP 1080800 A3 20030122; EP 1080800 B1 20050112; JP 2001071013 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111007

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2007-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050727

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009198 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, FRIEDRICH, DR.-ING.

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DR.-ING. ANDREAS HAUGER

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI