Global Patent Index - EP 1080804 A1

EP 1080804 A1 2001-03-07 - Method of joining workpieces and workpiece provided with a fastner

Title (en)

Method of joining workpieces and workpiece provided with a fastner

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbindung mehrerer Bauteile sowie Bauteil mit einem Befestigungselement

Title (fr)

Procédé pour joindre des pièces et pièce avec élément de fixation

Publication

EP 1080804 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00118716 A

Priority

DE 19941776 A

Abstract (en)

The connecting process involves connecting two or more components (11) in a fixing element (12) by deforming the fixing element in two successive stages. The first deformation stage covers a greater area than the second deformation stage. The fixing element may be produced by a deformation process carried out in a single working step.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Befestigungselementes (12), insbesondere zur Verbindung zweier oder mehrerer Bauteile (11,13,14), wird das Befestigungselement (12) in zwei aufeinanderfolgenden Umformschritten ausgeformt, wobei der erste Umformschritt auf eine größere Fläche einwirkt, als der zweite. Bei einem weiteren Verfahen zur Herstellung des Befestigungselementes (12) wird dieses durch einen in einem Arbeitsschritt durchgeführten Umformvorgang gebildet. Bei einem Verfahren zur Verbindung mehrerer Bauteile (11,13,14) wird ein erstes Bauteil (11) derart ausgeformt, daß durch das Befestigungsmittel (12) das erste Bauteil (11) und mindestens ein weiteres Bauteil (14), insbesondere mit einer insgesamt größeren Materialstärke, als die des ersten Bauteiles (11), ohne zusätzliche Verbindungsmittel beispielsweise formschlüssig verbindbar sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/03; B21D 22/04; B21K 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/04 (2006.01); B21D 39/03 (2006.01); B21J 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/02 (2013.01); B21D 22/04 (2013.01); B21D 39/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080804 A1 20010307; DE 19941776 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI