Global patent index - EP 1080805 A1

EP 1080805 A1 2001-03-07 - Positioning conveyor for horizontal aligning of plates

Title (en)

Positioning conveyor for horizontal aligning of plates

Title (de)

Positionierungsförderer zum horizontalen Ausrichten von Platten

Title (fr)

Transporteur de positionnement pour l'alignement horizontal des tôles

Publication

EP 1080805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112444 A

Priority

DE 19941037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19941037C1] The conveyor table has drive means and at least one stop (10, 14) along the edge which is provided with a thickness measuring device (22, 24) to measure the thickness of the plate abutting same. An anvil surface (18) is provided on the stop to support the plate and at least one drop down preferably swivel mounted scanning finger is fitted on the stop above the anvil surface. The scanning finger is connected to a path measuring device.

Abstract (de)

Ein Positionierungsförderer zum horizontalen Ausrichten von Platten, Blechen und dergleichen mit einem mit Antriebsmitteln versehenen Fördertisch und wenigstens einem Anschlag (10,14) an einem Rand des Fördertisches, weist eine an dem Anschlag vorgesehene Stärkenmeßeinrichtung (22,24,54) zur Messung der Plattenstärke der anschlagenden Platten, Bleche oder dergleichen auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/02; B65H 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941037 C1 20010104; EP 1080805 A1 20010307; EP 1080805 B1 20041110; ES 2231080 T3 20050516; US 6430837 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060612

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060610

2006-06-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060610

2006-01-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-12-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-05-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2231080

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008575

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040114

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI