Global Patent Index - EP 1080809 A1

EP 1080809 A1 2001-03-07 - Method for controlling the distribution of quantity of liquid metal

Title (en)

Method for controlling the distribution of quantity of liquid metal

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung der Metalldosiermenge

Title (fr)

Méthode pour contrôler la distribution de quantité de métal liquide

Publication

EP 1080809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114000 A

Priority

DE 19941430 A

Abstract (en)

Regulating the metal dosing in a vacuum die casting machine comprises measuring the metal melt (6) within the heat maintaining oven (7) by determining the actual value using as sensor (11, 12, 13) to exactly determine the melt dose in a casting chamber (9); comparing the measured values with theoretical values in a computer (14); and regulating an evacuation device (15) and/or a vacuum valve (5). Preferred Features: The flow through time and/or the flow through amount is regulated at the vacuum valve. The temperature of the melt is measured using a sensor (12), the sensor being connected to the computer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Regelung von Giessparameter und insbesondere die Regelung der Dosierung der Metallschmelze (6) in einer Giesskammer (9) einer Vakuum-Druckgiessmaschine. Mit Rechner (14) verbundene Messeinrichtungen (11, 12,13) erfassen Volumen und Beschaffenheit der Schmelze und in Form eines Regelkreises erfolgt eine Regelung einer Evakuiereinrichtung (15) und/oder eines Vakuumventils (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/32; B22D 17/14; B22D 18/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 39/02 (2006.01); B22D 17/14 (2006.01); B22D 17/30 (2006.01); B22D 17/32 (2006.01); B22D 39/04 (2006.01); B22D 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/32 (2013.01); B22D 17/14 (2013.01); B22D 17/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941430 A1 20010301; AT 289238 T 20050315; EP 1080809 A1 20010307; EP 1080809 B1 20050216; ES 2237367 T3 20050801; JP 2001079654 A 20010327; JP 4660660 B2 20110330; US 6379609 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2237367

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009534

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040210

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010414

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI