Global Patent Index - EP 1080833 A2

EP 1080833 A2 2001-03-07 - Method and apparatus for inclined centerless plunge-cut grinding

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for inclined centerless plunge-cut grinding

Title (de)

Verfahren zum spitzenlosen Schräg-Einstechschleifen und Schleifmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de rectification "sans centre" en plongée oblique

Publication

EP 1080833 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117794 A

Priority

DE 19940685 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves rotating a work piece (34) about an axis inclined by a given angle at a conical grinding wheel (16), to engage at least part of its surface. The grinding wheel and the work piece are advanced through a given overmeasure (A) in at least two steps. In a first step, they are advanced in a radial direction (74/1) to grind a cylindrical section (50,52) and in the second step they are advanced in an axial direction to grind a conical shoulder section (52). An Independent claim is included for a grinding machine for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren und eine Schleifmaschine dienen zum spitzenlosen Schräg-Einstechschleifen an einem um eine erste Achse (35) drehbaren Werkstück (34). Das Werkstück (34) umfaßt im wesentlichen zylindrische Abschnitte (50, 54) unterschiedlichen Durchmessers und mindestens eine zwischen den Abschnitten (50, 54) liegende Schulter (52). Eine an ihrem Umfang konisch ausgebildete Schleifscheibe (16) ist um ihre, zur Werkstückachse (35) um einen vorbestimmten Winkel geneigte Achse drehbar angeordnet. Mindestens eine Mantellinie des Umfanges wird in Eingriff mit dem Werkstück (34) gebracht. Die Schleifscheibe (16) und das Werkstück (34) sind um ein vorbestimmtes Aufmaß (A) relativ zueinander zustellbar, und zwar in mindestens zwei Schritten. In einem ersten Schritt (74/1) wird im wesentlichen in radialer Richtung (X) und in einem zweiten Schritt (74/2) im wesentlichen in axialer Richtung (Z) zugestellt, derart, daß im ersten Schritt im wesentlichen das Aufmaß (80, 82) im Bereich der zylindrischen Abschnitte (50, 54) und im zweiten Schritt im wesentlichen das Aufmaß (84) der Schulter (52) abgetragen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/01; B24B 5/18; B24B 5/22; B24B 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/24 (2006.01); B24B 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940685 A1 20010301; EP 1080833 A2 20010307; EP 1080833 A3 20030917; JP 2001105287 A 20010417; US 6312318 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 5/01 A

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 5/18 B

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 5/22 B

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 51/00 B

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MUSHARDT, HEINRICK, DR.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RAUCH, INGO

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI