Global Patent Index - EP 1080834 A2

EP 1080834 A2 2001-03-07 - Centerless grinding machine

Title (en)

Centerless grinding machine

Title (de)

Schleifmaschinen zum spitzenlosen Schleifen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Rectifieuse "sans centre"

Publication

EP 1080834 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117698 A

Priority

DE 19940687 A

Abstract (en)

The machine is arranged on a longitudinal support (40) with a first sliding carriage (18',30) on one side of the longitudinal central plane for a grinding wheel (20') and a second sliding carriage (22',32) on the other side for a regulating wheel (24'). Adjusting devices (48,50) adjust the grinding and regulating wheels in determined positions in the longitudinal central plane.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schleifmaschine dient zum spitzenlosen Schleifen von Werkstücken (26), die im Bereich einer Längsebene (28) der Schleifmaschine (10) auf einer Auflage (40) angeordnet sind. Sie umfaßt einen seitlich von der Längsebene (28) angeordneten ersten Schlitten (18) für eine Schleifscheibe (20), einen ebenfalls seitlich von der Längsebene (28) angeordneten zweiten Schlitten (22) für eine Regelscheibe (24), ein erstes Abrichtwerkzeug (48) zum Abrichten der Schleifscheibe (20) an einer ersten vorbestimmten Position und ein zweites Abrichtwerkzeug (50) zum Abrichten der Regelscheibe (24) an einer zweiten vorbestimmten Position. Die Positionen befinden sich im Bereich der Längsebene (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/18; B24B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/18 (2006.01); B24B 53/00 (2006.01); B24B 53/047 (2006.01); B24B 53/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/00 (2013.01); B24B 5/18 (2013.01); Y10S 451/909 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940687 A1 20010301; EP 1080834 A2 20010307; EP 1080834 A3 20030910; JP 2001105313 A 20010417; US 6569000 B1 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-07-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI