Global Patent Index - EP 1080843 A2

EP 1080843 A2 2001-03-07 - Method and apparatus for CNC controlled dressing of the regulating wheel of a centerless grinding machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for CNC controlled dressing of the regulating wheel of a centerless grinding machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum CNC-gesteuerten Abrichten einer Regelscheibe einer spitzenlosen Schleifmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour dressage par commande numérique de la roue de régulation d'une rectifieuse "sans centre"

Publication

EP 1080843 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117798 A

Priority

DE 19940686 A

Abstract (en)

CNC controlled trimming of the regulating pulley (32) of a milling machine for centreless milling of a workpiece (38) in which the trimming tool for the regulating pulley is numerically controlled, in order to provide a desired circumferential profile to the regulating pulley. The procedure is achieved by entry of control parameters to the milling machine and measurement of workpiece parameters. The two sets of parameters are then transformed into a pre-set circumferential profile for the regulating pulley. The data are then converted to CNC control data and relative processing of regulating pulley and trimming tool using the CNC control data produces the desired circumferential profile on the pulley. Independent claims are made for a centreless milling procedure and a milling machine using the procedure.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum CNC-gesteuerten Abrichten einer Regelscheibe einer Schleifmaschine für einen spitzenlosen Schleifprozeß an einem Werkstück werden beschrieben ebenso wie ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum spitzenlosen Schleifen eines Werkstücks. Dabei wird ein Abrichtwerkzeug für die Regelscheibe unter numerischer Steuerung ihrer Bewegung mit der Regelscheibe in Eingriff gebracht und an dieser entlang geführt, um ein vorbestimmtes Umfangsprofil der Regelscheibe zu erzeugen. Es werden vorbestimmte erste, die Durchführung des Schleifprozesses bestimmende Parameter (DS, DR, yR, x,y,z(A), yAS, A, B) der Schleifmaschine sowie vorbestimmte zweite, die Durchführung des Schleifprozesses bestimmende Parameter (DW, PW) des Werkstücks erfaßt. Diese werden in Daten für ein vorbestimmtes Umfangsprofil der Regelscheibe transformiert und in CNC-Steuerdaten umgesetzt. Regelscheibe und Abrichtwerkzeug werden dann relativ zueinander in Abhängigkeit von den CNC-Steuerdaten verfahren, derart, daß das Abrichtwerkzeug an der Regelscheibe das vorbestimmte Umfangsprofil erzeugt. Das Werkstück wird dann unter Anlage an der Regelscheibe geschliffen. Dieser Vorgang erfolgt vorzugsweise iterativ, indem nach einem ersten Schleifprozeß noch festgestellte Konturfehler des Werkstücks zur Korrektur bei der Transformation oder der Umsetzung eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 53/08; B24B 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/08 (2006.01); B24B 5/30 (2006.01); B24B 49/18 (2006.01); B24B 53/00 (2006.01); B24B 53/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/30 (2013.01); B24B 49/18 (2013.01); B24B 53/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940686 A1 20010301; EP 1080843 A2 20010307; EP 1080843 A3 20030910; JP 2001079762 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-07-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUSHARDT, HEINRICH, DR.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOTAWA, GUIDO

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI