Global Patent Index - EP 1080848 A2

EP 1080848 A2 2001-03-07 - Intermediate piece for a screwdriver shaft

Title (en)

Intermediate piece for a screwdriver shaft

Title (de)

Zwischenglied für eine Handschrauberwelle

Title (fr)

Pièce intermédiaire pour tiege de tournevis

Publication

EP 1080848 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118451 A

Priority

DE 19942292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19942292A1] The intermediate member (5) has a casing (7) outside it, from which an insertion pin (8) for a torque key (9) projects radially. The casing contains a rotating drive member (10) and a driven member (14) with a polygonal dowel or recess (13), and two releasable couplings (17, 18) with fixed and axially movable parts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Handschrauber, in dessen Abtrieb erfindungsgemäß ein Zwischenglied eingefügt ist, welches bei serienmäßig manuell zu montierenden Verschraubungen ohne Werkzeugwechsel ein rasches Arbeiten, gleichwohl aber ein Soll-Anzugsmoment zuverlässig einzuhalten erlaubt. Die Schrauben werden mit dem Handschrauber rasch eingedreht und bei geringem Moment fixiert. Mittels eines außenseitig am Zwischenglied angesteckten Drehmomentschlüssels kann unmittelbar anschließend das Soll-Anzugsmoment aufgebracht werden. Damit dies möglich ist, ist in dem Zwischenglied eine aus zwei gegensinnig schaltenden Einzelkupllungen gebildete Wechselkupplung vorgersehen, die im Stillstand umschaltbar ist und mit der der Kraftfluß vom Schrauber auf den Drehmomentenschlüssel umschaltbar ist. Dieses Umschalten kann sinnfälliger Weise durch axiales Entlasten seitens des Handschraubers erfolgen. Die drehmoment-übertragenden Teile des Zwischengliedes können an das Gehäuses auch über eine Ratsche angekoppelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/142 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/141 (2013.01); B25B 21/00 (2013.01); B25B 23/1427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19942292 A1 20001026; DE 19942292 C2 20010927; EP 1080848 A2 20010307; EP 1080848 A3 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI