Global Patent Index - EP 1080853 A2

EP 1080853 A2 2001-03-07 - Punch ring

Title (en)

Punch ring

Title (de)

Ringförmiges Stanzwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de poinçonnage circulaire

Publication

EP 1080853 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307574 A

Priority

  • US 15276899 P
  • US 64536500 A

Abstract (en)

An improved punch ring (40) for a hole punching system used to punch lines of holes in a passing paper web. The ring (40) has a punch receiving portion (42). The punch receiving portion (42) includes a number of radially extending grooves (54) spaced about the circumference of the punch receiving portion (42) to receive hardened punches (56). The punch receiving portion (42) also includes a number of cylindrical bores (50) extending through the punch receiving portion (42) between adjacent pairs of the grooves (54) that each receive a clamp screw (52). A clamp ring (44) includes a number of threaded apertures (62) alignable with the bores (50) in the punch receiving portion (42). The clamp ring (44) is placed against the punches (56) in the grooves (54). Clamp screws (42) are inserted through the bores (50) to engage the threaded apertures (62) in the clamp ring (44) to hold the clamp ring (44) in engagement with the punch receiving portion (42) and retain the punches (56) in the grooves (54). The use of the clamp ring (44) avoids the problems heretofore encountered when screws are used to hold punches in a punch ring. Furthermore, the separate clamp ring (44) eliminates the need for the removal of the entire punch ring (40) and shaft from the system should the threads in the clamp ring (44) become damaged by the clamp screws (52). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080853 A2 20010307; EP 1080853 A3 20021009

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI