Global Patent Index - EP 1080856 A1

EP 1080856 A1 2001-03-07 - Apparatus for producing cork washers

Title (en)

Apparatus for producing cork washers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Korkscheiben

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la fabrication de rondelles en liège

Publication

EP 1080856 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117034 A

Priority

EP 99117034 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus includes cutting means (4) for obtaining diskshaped washers from a semi-manufactured product (2) of natural cork, positioning means (22, 24) provided with a hollow body (22) and controlling means (24) for positioning said semi-manufactured product (2) so that its pores are disposed in a parallel manner with respect to said cutting means (4); the hollow body (22) is associated to lever means (46) oscillating between an external position in which said semi-manufactured product does not interfere with said cutting means (4) and an internal position in which said semi-manufactured product (2) interferes with said cutting means (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27J 5/00; B26D 1/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/147 (2006.01); B27J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27J 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080856 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040615

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR IT PT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI