Global Patent Index - EP 1080858 A2

EP 1080858 A2 2001-03-07 - Apparatus for generating vibrations

Title (en)

Apparatus for generating vibrations

Title (de)

Rüttelantrieb

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'obtention de vibrations

Publication

EP 1080858 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114460 A

Priority

DE 19940119 A

Abstract (en)

The drive has at least one piezoelectric vibration stimulator (9) with a piezoelement mounted in a housing of the stimulator so as to be able to vibrate. The piezoelement has a drive connection to an imbalance wt. mounted so as to be free to vibrate in the housing of the stimulator. The housing is a mounted on a mould (3), a vibrating table or another part to be set vibrating.

Abstract (de)

Der Rüttelantrieb eignet sich besonders für eine Form (3) zur Herstellung von Betonformkörpern und besteht aus mindestens einem piezoelektrischen Schwingungserreger (9), der an der Form (3) fest angeordnet ist. Der Schwingungserreger (9) wird durch ein Gehäuse (10) gebildet, in dem eine Unwuchtmasse (14) beweglich gelagert ist, die mit einem ebenfalls im Gehäuse (10) schwingbar angeordneten Piezoelement (11) in Antriebsverbindung steht. Durch Anlegen einer Wechselspannung an das Piezoelement (11) entsteht eine Verformungsbewegung, die in eine oszillierende Bewegung der Unwuchtmasse (14) umgewandelt wird und somit Rüttelschwingungen der Form (3) erzeugt. Durch die Verwendung einer unterschiedlichen Anzahl von Schwingungserregern (9), die relativ klein und kompakt dimensioniert werden können, sowie deren Anbringung an verschiedenen Stellen der Form (3) mit horizontaler und/oder vertikaler Schwingrichtung, kann der Rüttelantrieb und damit das Schwingverhalten der Form (3) den unterschiedlichen Betriebsbedingungen angepaßt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/087; B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/16 (2006.01); B28B 1/087 (2006.01); B28B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/0873 (2013.01); B06B 1/16 (2013.01); B28B 3/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940119 A1 20010301; AT 341430 T 20061015; CA 2316455 A1 20010224; CA 2316455 C 20080708; DE 50013543 D1 20061116; DK 1080858 T3 20061211; EP 1080858 A2 20010307; EP 1080858 A3 20021113; EP 1080858 B1 20061004; ES 2270763 T3 20070416; US 6402499 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070105

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2008-02-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

- Free text: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH#ZWICKAUER STRASSE 131#08485 LENGENFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KOBRA FORMEN GMBH#PLOHNBACHSTRASSE 1#08485 LENGENFELD (DE)

2008-02-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037574

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-07-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270763 T3

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-01-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013543 P 20061116

2006-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 1/08 A, 7B 28B 3/02 B, 7B 06B 1/06 B, 7B 28B 1/087 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI