Global Patent Index - EP 1080872 A2

EP 1080872 A2 2001-03-07 - Process for mechanically dehydrating, in particular, beet chips

Title (en)

Process for mechanically dehydrating, in particular, beet chips

Title (de)

Verfahren zur mechanischen Entwässerung von insbesondere Rüben-Extraktionsschnitzeln

Title (fr)

Procédé de déshydratation mécanique, en particulier, de cossettes de betteraves

Publication

EP 1080872 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113338 A

Priority

DE 19940742 A

Abstract (en)

At least in the last axial sector of the press run, the radially outer and/or radially inner edge layer (6a,6b) of the material press feed adjoining the respective screening surface (5a,5b) is parted from the radially center layer of the feed (8) and moved away from the screening surfaces. Thus one of the two radial layers (6a,6b) is moved out by the press through the suitably sectioned discharge opening (9). In a variant, the edge layer is led into the opening (9) by scrapers reaching into the press feed path. One or other of the radial layers can be turned round its axi-parallel axis and thus exchanged with the center layer (8) without mixing, preferably with the aid of fixed inserts in the form of static mixing elements with axially crisscrossed conveying channels.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur mechanischen Entwässerung von Flüssigkeit enthaltenden Feststoffen, insbesondere faserartigen Feststoffen, wie Rüben-Extraktionsschnitzeln (RES), in einer Schraubenpresse (1), durch die der abzupressende Feststoff (2) von zumindest einem drehbar antreibbaren Schraubenelement (3) in dessen axialer Richtung (4) an einer stationären äußeren, das Schraubenelement (3) umschließenden, und/oder an einer inneren, mit dem Schraubenelement (3) rotierenden, jeweils eine Entwässerungsfläche bildenden Siebfläche (5a,5b) unter Einwirkung von Normal- und Scherkräften entlanggefördert und hierbei einer Pressung unterworfen wird, wobei die hierdurch ausgepreßte Flüssigkeit bezogen auf das Schraubenelement (3) etwa radial nach außen und/oder radial nach innen abgeführt wird. Zur Verbesserung des Wirkungsgrades wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß zumindest im letzten Abschnitt der axialen Preßstrecke die radial äußere und/oder radial innere, jeweils von einer Siebfläche (5a,5b) begrenzte Randschicht (6a,6b) des Preßgutes von dem radial mittleren Preßgut (8) getrennt und von der bzw. den Siebflächen (5a,5b) weggefördert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/12; B30B 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/12 (2006.01); B30B 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/128 (2013.01); B30B 9/12 (2013.01); B30B 9/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940742 A1 20010301; EP 1080872 A2 20010307; EP 1080872 A3 20020313; EP 1080872 B1 20030806

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003167 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI