Global Patent Index - EP 1080887 A1

EP 1080887 A1 2001-03-07 - Web position control system

Title (en)

Web position control system

Title (de)

Bahnlagekontrollsystem

Title (fr)

Système de contrôle de la position d'une bande

Publication

EP 1080887 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306343 A

Priority

US 37734599 A

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for controlling the lateral and longitudinal position of the web (16) with respect to various processing units (20,22,24,26) operating on the web (16) using a correlation between scanned image data and reference image data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/58 (2006.01); B41F 33/06 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B65H 23/035 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/048 (2013.01); B65H 23/035 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/21 (2013.01); B65H 2511/232 (2013.01); B65H 2553/42 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  2. B65H 2511/21 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  3. B65H 2511/232 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080887 A1 20010307; JP 2001129975 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI