Global Patent Index - EP 1080931 A2

EP 1080931 A2 2001-03-07 - Universal ink ribbon core

Title (en)

Universal ink ribbon core

Title (de)

Universeller Farbbandkern

Title (fr)

Noyau universel de ruban encreur

Publication

EP 1080931 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112903 A

Priority

JP 662799 U

Abstract (en)

A universal ink ribbon core (10) has three notches (20a,20b,20c) spaced with 90 DEG intervals between the first and second notches (20a,20b) and between the second and third notches (20b,20c). In an alternate embodiment, a fourth notch (20d) is provided spaced at an interval of 150 DEG from either the first notch (20a) or the third notch (20c). The notches at one end of a core are formed at angular positions which are the same as the angular positions of the notches at the other end. An ink ribbon core of the invention may be installed in almost all types of printers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080931 A2 20010307; EP 1080931 A3 20010822

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033564

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020223

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI