Global Patent Index - EP 1080942 A1

EP 1080942 A1 2001-03-07 - Method for erasing a lithographic printing master

Title (en)

Method for erasing a lithographic printing master

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erneuerung einer Flachdruckplatte

Title (fr)

Méthode de régénération d'une plaque d'impression lithographique

Publication

EP 1080942 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202799 A

Priority

EP 99202799 A

Abstract (en)

A method is disclosed for removing ink accepting areas of a printing surface of a lithographic printing master by treatment with an atmospheric plasma. Preferably, the plasma is directed to the printing surface as a plasma jet while the printing master is mounted on the plate cylinder of a printing press. The method enables to clean a support of a printing master and then reuse the cleaned support for making another printing master. Preferably, all the following steps are performed on-press : (i) making an imaging material by providing a support with an image recording layer; (ii) making a printing master having a printing surface comprising ink accepting areas by image-wise exposing and optionally developing the imaging material; (iii) starting a pressrun; (iv) a cleaning step using an atmospheric plasma and then repeating steps (i) to (iv). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/055 (2006.01); B41M 1/06 (2006.01); B41N 1/12 (2006.01); B41N 3/00 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/006 (2013.01); B41C 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080942 A1 20010307; EP 1080942 B1 20031210; EP 1080942 B2 20091014; DE 69913518 D1 20040122; DE 69913518 T2 20041111; JP 2001105763 A 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110831

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20091014

2009-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913518 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI