Global Patent Index - EP 1080943 A1

EP 1080943 A1 2001-03-07 - Fountain solution composition for lithographic printing plate

Title (en)

Fountain solution composition for lithographic printing plate

Title (de)

Feuchtigkeitslösungzusammensetzung für Flachdruckplatte

Title (fr)

Composition de solution de mouillage pour plaque d'impression lithographique

Publication

EP 1080943 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118277 A

Priority

JP 25179899 A

Abstract (en)

Fountain solution compositions for lithographic printing plate which can be favorably and safely used in a working environment as a substitute for isopropyl alcohol, show low dynamic surface tension, exert good and stable printability even in case where printing units rotate at a high speed, and show good printability for various inks, thereby giving printed matters with high qualities. The fountain solution composition for lithographic printing plate comprises at least one compound represented by the following formula (I) and at least one compound represented by the following formula (II): R<1>O-(-CH2CH(CH3)-O-)m-H wherein R<1> represents a linear or branched alkyl group having 4 carbon atoms, and m is an integer of 1 to 3; OH- (-CH2CH(CH3)-O-)n-H wherein n is an integer of 1 to 5.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1080943 A1 20010307; JP 2001071658 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI