Global Patent Index - EP 1081072 A2

EP 1081072 A2 2001-03-07 - Device for automatically changing the pile in a sheet feeder

Title (en)

Device for automatically changing the pile in a sheet feeder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum automatischen Stapelwechsel an einem Bogenanleger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour automatiquement changer la pile dans un margeur de feuilles

Publication

EP 1081072 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118344 A

Priority

DE 19941918 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19941918C1] The method involves raising a new stack (S) slowly from below against bearer rods (7) and detecting the bearer rod position when the new stack butts against them. If a difference is detected whereby one or all rods are raised further near the non-stop device (3) than at their free ends, the lifting mechanism is stopped whilst a residual lifting mechanism (5) continues until a maximum permissible signal difference is reached and the rod movement is then continued. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Stapelwechsel in einer Bogen verarbeitenden Maschine. Vorgesehen ist eine Non-Stop-Einrichtung (3) in einem Bogenanleger (2), wobei motorisch angetriebene Tragstäbe (7) zur zeitweiligen Aufnahme eines Reststapels (R) beim Einsetzen eines neuen Bogenstapels (S) dienen. Bei der Vereinigung von Reststapel (R) und Bogenstapel (S) wird mittels Tastorganen (11) die vertikale Verlagerung der Tragstäbe (7) an der Non-Stop-Einrichtung (3) überwacht, um ein Verklemmen der Tragstäbe (7) zu verhindern. Eine Schaltungseinrichtung überwacht die Verlagerung der Tragstäbe (7) während des gesamten Stapelwechselvorganges. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/06 (2006.01); B65H 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 2405/3231 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941918 C1 20001109; AT 258890 T 20040215; EP 1081072 A2 20010307; EP 1081072 A3 20020206; EP 1081072 B1 20040204; JP 2001088954 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005176

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50005176

- Effective date: 20120509

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090824

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005176 P 20040311

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 1/26 A, 7B 65H 1/30 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI