Global Patent Index - EP 1081076 A2

EP 1081076 A2 2001-03-07 - Device and method for transferring a strip of a material web

Title (en)

Device and method for transferring a strip of a material web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Überführen eines Materialbahnstreifens

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour transférer un ruban d'une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 1081076 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113657 A

Priority

DE 19941426 A

Abstract (en)

The device for guiding a web (33) through a manufacturing or processing machine from an entry zone (17) to a delivery zone (57) has a guide system (3) with a web take-up head defining a take up opening situated to one side of the direct path for the web. A first web guide (43) is located in the entry zone which can divert the web towards the take-up head and a second web guide in the delivery zone to return it to the direct path. An Independent claim is included for a method for guiding a web using the device.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Überführen eines Materialbahnstreifens innerhalb einer Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Bearbeitung einer Materialbahn von einem Übernahmebereich (17) in einen Übergabebereich entlang eines Bahnlaufweges und eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens vorgeschlagen. Die Vorrichtung umfaßt mindestens eine entlang des Bahnlaufweges verlagerbare, den Materialbahnstreifen während des Überführungsvorgangs führende Aufnahmeeinrichtung, die mindestens einen wenigstens eine Aufnahmeöffnung aufweisenden Aufnahmekopf umfaßt. Die Vorrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß der Aufnahmekopf (5) derart geführt ist, daß die Aufnahmeöffnung (7) -in Maschinenlaufrichtung gesehen- zum Bahnlaufweg seitlich versetzt angeordnet ist, und daß im Übernahmebereich eine erste Streifenleiteinrichtung (43) zur Verlagerung des Materialbahnstreifens aus dem Bahnlaufweg heraus in Richtung der Aufnahmeöffnung (7) und/oder im Übergabebereich (57) eine zweite Streifenleiteinrichtung (58) zur Führung des Materialbahnstreifens (33) in Richtung und entlang des weiteren Bahnlaufwegs vorgesehen sind/ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/30; B65H 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941426 A1 20010301; EP 1081076 A2 20010307; EP 1081076 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 23/30 A, 7B 65H 23/28 B, 7D 21G 9/00 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI