Global patent index - EP 1081078 A2

EP 1081078 A2 2001-03-07 - Printed matter transport device

Title (en)

Printed matter transport device

Title (de)

Transportvorrichtung für Schriftgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport de document

Publication

EP 1081078 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00810105 A

Priority

JP 24393699 A

Abstract (en)

In a printed matter transport device wherein a printed matter is gripped by a gripping mechanism of a chain and made to travel along a guide rail, to improve the durability of the guide rail and chain, to prevent misalignment, falling out and damage when an external force acts on the printed matter, to improve durability of a connecting part of a chain link (base) and the gripping mechanism, to reduce manufacturing costs, and to enable the printed matter to be firmly gripped. A chain with grips comprising first rollers respectively arranged on two sides in the center of the longitudinal direction of the bases, a second roller on one side perpendicular to the common center line of the first rollers and a grip mechanism on the opposite side, a guide rail, a chain drive means and a cam member, a guide rail, a chain drive means and a cam member are provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 2405/552 (2013.01); B65H 2405/581 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081078 A2 20010307; EP 1081078 A3 20020619; EP 1081078 B1 20040414; AT 264258 T 20040415; DE 60009816 D1 20040519; DE 60009816 T2 20050421; JP 2001063888 A 20010313; JP 3046308 B1 20000529

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090208

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090208

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-04-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009816

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI