Global Patent Index - EP 1081085 A2

EP 1081085 A2 2001-03-07 - Elevator without a machine room

Title (en)

Elevator without a machine room

Title (de)

Antriebsraumfreier Aufzug

Title (fr)

Ascenseur sans salle des machines

Publication

EP 1081085 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114147 A

Priority

JP 24285499 A

Abstract (en)

In an elevator apparatus, a driving machine is disposed not in a hoistway but at a hall entrance portion. The hall entrance portion is provided with hall doors, a door accommodating portion in which the hall doors are stored when the doors are opened, an entrance wall between the door accommodating portion and the elevator hall, and an hall entrance post. The driving machine is disposed in a space between the door accommodating portion and the entrance wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081085 A2 20010307; EP 1081085 A3 20020724; EP 1081085 B1 20031015; CN 1120124 C 20030903; CN 1286209 A 20010307; DE 60005898 D1 20031120; DE 60005898 T2 20040819; JP 2001063935 A 20010313; TW 496851 B 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080711

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-16 [REG GB 727H] SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-28 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-14 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005898 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 66B 11/00 A, 7B 66B 13/30 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI