Global Patent Index - EP 1081086 A1

EP 1081086 A1 2001-03-07 - Liftarrangement with a drive unit positioned in the liftshaft

Title (en)

Liftarrangement with a drive unit positioned in the liftshaft

Title (de)

Aufzugsanlage mit einer in einem Aufzugsschacht angeordneten Antriebseinheit

Title (fr)

Installation d'ascenseur comprenant une unité d'entraînement disposée dans le puits d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1081086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116911 A

Priority

  • EP 00116911 A
  • EP 99810745 A

Abstract (en)

The lift unit has a drive unit (4). A control box (6) is fitted above the drive unit in a niche (1.21) in the wall of the lift shaft (1). The drive unit and control box are accessible via a service door (1.23) from the bottom floor (5), where they are mounted cornerwise on the bottom floor structure to make better use of the shaft cross section.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser auf dem Rucksack-Prinzip beruhenden Aufzugsanlage ist die Aufzugskabine (2) lateral aufgehängt. Die Aufzugskabine (2) wird von einem Tragrahmen (2.2) getragen, der an den Kabinenführungsschienen (2.1) geführt ist und am nicht dargestellten Tragseil aufgehängt ist. Die Antriebseinheit (4) ist teilweise in einer ersten Mauernische (1.21), teilweise auf einer Abstützung (1.22) angeordnet, wobei eine Treibscheibe (4.1) der Antriebseinheit (4) in den Aufzugsschacht (1) ragt. Die Aufzugskabine (2) ist mittels des über Treibscheibe (4.1) und Umlenkrollen geführten Tragseiles mit dem Gegengewicht (3) verbunden. Oberhalb der Antriebseinheit (4) ist in der ersten Mauernische (1.21) ein Steuerschrank (6) angeordnet. Antriebseinheit (4) und Steuerschrank (6) sind über eine Unterhaltstür (1.23) vom Stockwerk (5) her zugänglich. Die Antriebseinheit (4) und der Steuerschrank (6) sind auf dem untersten Stockwerk (5) über Eck angeordnet, wodurch der Schachtquerschnitt optimal nutzbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04; B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/002 (2013.01); B66B 11/0438 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081086 A1 20010307; EP 1081086 B1 20051012

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-13 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50011320

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100805

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100805

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011320 P 20060223

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040720

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI