Global patent index - EP 1081087 A1

EP 1081087 A1 2001-03-07 - Escalator or walkway with a safety balustrade

Title (en)

Escalator or walkway with a safety balustrade

Title (de)

Fahrtreppe oder Fahrsteig mit einer Sicherheitsbalustrade

Title (fr)

Escalier ou tapis roulant avec une balustrade sécurisée

Publication

EP 1081087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810793 A

Priority

EP 99810793 A

Abstract (en)

The escalator (1) consists of a carrier body (1.2), a step belt or pallet belt (1.1), a balustrade (4) with a body (4.2) of glass (4.3) and a handrail belt (3) carried by the balustrade. The balustrade body has a coating (4.4), which in the event of the glass breaking, retains the glass splinters. The coating may be a foil bonded to the glass by a glue layer (7).

Abstract (de)

Bei Fahrtreppen (1) mit einem Balustradenkörper (4.2) aus Glas wird üblicherweise ein Einscheibensicherheitsglas verwendet, das bei Beschädigung zwar nicht splittert aber dennoch in Teile bersten kann. Erfindungsgemäss ist auf das Glas eine Beschichtung in der Form beispielsweise einer Folie und einer Klebeschicht aufgetragen. Falls das Glas bricht, bleiben die Glasteile mit der Folie über die Klebeschicht verbunden. Unter der Fahrtreppe sich befindende Personen sind keiner Gefahr ausgesetzt, weil die Glasteile mittels der Beschichtung gehalten werden. Auch gelangen keine Glasteile in das Stufenband (1.1) und/oder zwischen Stufe (1.3) und Balustradenfuss (5), was die Betriebsbereitschaft der Fahrtreppe (1) auch nach einem Glasbruch nicht beeinträchtigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 138 (M - 1573) 8 March 1994 (1994-03-08)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 146 (M - 1102) 12 April 1991 (1991-04-12)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 138 (M - 1573) 8 March 1994 (1994-03-08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081087 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020331

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI