Global Patent Index - EP 1081091 A1

EP 1081091 A1 2001-03-07 - Filling machine with vacuum generating means

Title (en)

Filling machine with vacuum generating means

Title (de)

Füllmaschine mit Mitteln zum Erzeugen von Vakuum

Title (fr)

Machine de remplissage ayants des moyens de génération de vide

Publication

EP 1081091 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116593 A

Priority

DE 19941456 A

Abstract (en)

The filling machine has a rotor turning on a vertical axis (1) with fillers (9) round it for the bottles (15). Each filler run-out has a device (16) which can be supplied with a vacuum. This device runs on the rotor and is connected to a compressed air supply (23, 33) so that it can operate on the compressed air ejector principle.

Abstract (de)

Eine Füllmaschine zum Abfüllen von Getränken in Behälter, mit einem um eine lotrechte Achse (1) umlaufenden Rotor, auf dessen Umfang beabstandet Füllorgane (9) angeordnet sind, welche jeweils zum gesteuerten Abfüllen des Getränks durch einen Auslauf (13) in einen abgedichtet gegen diesen gehaltenen Behälter (15) ausgebildet sind, wobei jeder Auslauf von einer Einrichtung (16) mit Vakuum versorgbar ist, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Einrichtung mitlaufend auf dem Rotor angeordnet ist und, an Druckluft (23,33) angeschlossen, nach dem Druckluftejektorprinzip arbeitend ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/12; B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/12 (2006.01); B67C 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/22 (2013.01); B67C 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081091 A1 20010307; EP 1081091 B1 20020605; DE 19941456 C1 20010412; ES 2176148 T3 20021201

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2013-08-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130823

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000198

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-06-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-06-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176148 T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIG SIMONAZZI GERMANY GMBH

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000198 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI