Global Patent Index - EP 1081092 A2

EP 1081092 A2 2001-03-07 - Plastic tree for riding saddles

Title (en)

Plastic tree for riding saddles

Title (de)

Kunststoff-Sattelbaum für Reitsättel

Title (fr)

Arçon en plastique pour selle d'équitation

Publication

EP 1081092 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125523 A

Priority

DE 29915679 U

Abstract (en)

The saddle has a dish-like seat partition (4) and a stub-like section (6) located at its front. A window (14) is provided in the seat partition which is covered by a padded section (16). The padded section consists of two leather or plastic sections (20,22) which are sewn together , between which is provided a padding material section (24) such as foam, plastic, wool, etc.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kunststoff-Sattelbaum für Reitsättel mit einer schalenförmigen Sitzpartie (4) und einem vorderseitig daran anschließenden, zum Widerrist des Pferdes hin laufenden, nach oben erhabenen Stegabschnitt (6) kennzeichnet sich dadurch, daß in der Sitzpartie ein von einem Polsterkissen (16) abgedecktes Fenster (14) ausgespart ist. Damit kann ein in der Sitzpartie weicherer Sattel als unter Verwendung herkömmlicher Kunststoff-Sattelbäume gefertigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/02 (2013.01); B68C 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915679 U1 19991202; AU 1486200 A 20010308; AU 771044 B2 20040311; EP 1081092 A2 20010307; EP 1081092 A3 20020807; US 6370849 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI