Global Patent Index - EP 1081201 A1

EP 1081201 A1 2001-03-07 - Sealing material composition for cards and process for producing cards using the composition

Title (en)

Sealing material composition for cards and process for producing cards using the composition

Title (de)

Versiegelungsmaterialzusammensetzung für Karten und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Karten unter Verwendung der Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition de matériau de scellement pour cartes et procédé de fabrication de cartes utilisant cette composition

Publication

EP 1081201 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00116279 A

Priority

JP 24927499 A

Abstract (en)

A sealing material composition for cards which comprises (A) an acrylate compound polymerizable by an ionizing radiation and (B) 1 to 40 parts by weight of a polyfunctional isocyanate compound per 100 parts by weight of the acrylate compound and can be cured by irradiation of the ionizing radiation and a process for producing cards comprising disposing a coating layer comprising the above sealing material composition between a substrate sheet and a cover sheet and curing the coating layer by irradiation of an ionizing radiation. The sealing material composition gives excellent adhesion between a substrate sheet and a cover sheet and provides cards having faces with little unevenness, suitable flexibility and excellent reliability. The process provides cards having the above characteristics. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09J 4/02; C09J 11/06; H01L 23/29; H05K 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/07 (2006.01); C09J 4/00 (2006.01); C09J 4/02 (2006.01); C09J 175/00 (2006.01); C09K 3/10 (2006.01); G06K 19/02 (2006.01); G06K 19/077 (2006.01); H01L 23/29 (2006.01); H05K 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/07779 (2013.01); G06K 19/02 (2013.01); G06K 19/07749 (2013.01); G06K 19/07783 (2013.01); H01L 23/293 (2013.01); H05K 3/284 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01); Y10S 428/901 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24917 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081201 A1 20010307; EP 1081201 B1 20050209; CN 1174055 C 20041103; CN 1287139 A 20010314; DE 60017997 D1 20050317; DE 60017997 T2 20050707; JP 2001072960 A 20010321; KR 20010050318 A 20010615; SG 86433 A1 20020219; TW 502058 B 20020911; US 6592973 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070809

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60017997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI