Global patent index - EP 1081213 A1

EP 1081213 A1 2001-03-07 - Foam-controlled solid detergents

Title (en)

Foam-controlled solid detergents

Title (de)

Schaumkontrollierte feste Waschmittel

Title (fr)

Agents de lavage solides à mousse contrôlée

Publication

EP 1081213 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117477 A

Priority

DE 19939806 A

Abstract (en)

Foam controlled solid detergent containing anionic and non-ionic surfactants and defoamer contains two different non-ionic surfactants. Foam controlled solid detergent containing anionic and non-ionic surfactants and defoamer contains a non-ionic surfactant(s) of formula (I) and a non-ionic surfactant(s) of formula (II); R<1>COO(CH2CHR<3>O)xR<2> (I); R<4>O(CH2CH2O)yH (II); x and y = 1-20; R<1>CO = 6-22C acyl; R<2> = 1-4C alkyl; R<3> = H or (m)ethyl; and R<4> = alkyl derived from 30-60 wt.% 8-22C alcohols, 10-20 wt.% methyl-branched 8-22C alcohols and 30-50 wt.% 8-22C alcohols branched with at least 2C alkyl.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung liegt auf dem Gebiet der festen Waschmittel, insbesondere für die Haushaltswäsche von Textilien, und betrifft schaumkontrollierte feste Waschmittel enthaltend anionische Tenside, eine spezielle nichtionische Tensidmischung sowie Entschäumer. Ein weiterer Gegenstand der vorliegenden Anmeldung betrifft die Verwendung von alkoxylierten Fettsäurealkylestern als schaumkontrollierende Verbindung in diesen Waschmitteln.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 1/72; C11D 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0814152 A2 19971229 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]
  • [A] WO 9629389 A1 19960926 - HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al
  • [PA] DE 19854525 A1 20000531 - COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]
  • [A] EP 0019734 A1 19801210 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]
  • [A] LITTAU C ET AL: "OPTIMIZATION OF SURFACTANT SYSTEMS CONTAINING METHYL ESTER ETHOXYLATES", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE,DE,VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, H. ZIOLKOWSKY K.G. AUGSBURG, vol. 124, no. 11, 1 October 1998 (1998-10-01), pages 690,692,694,69, XP000778430, ISSN: 0942-7694

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19939806 A1 20010222; EP 1081213 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000812

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI