Global Patent Index - EP 1081243 A1

EP 1081243 A1 2001-03-07 - Member formed from magnesium alloy

Title (en)

Member formed from magnesium alloy

Title (de)

Bauteil hergestellt aus Magnesium-Legierung

Title (fr)

Elément à partir d'un alliage de magnésium

Publication

EP 1081243 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00117254 A

Priority

JP 25173899 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a member formed by magnesium alloy which has a solid phase fraction of more than 0% to 60% or less, contains 2.0 wt% or more to 6.5 wt% or less of aluminum, and has an internal defective ratio of 1% or less and a strain rate of 1 x 10<2>/s or more. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 23/02; C22C 1/00; B22D 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/04 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/007 (2013.01); C22C 1/005 (2013.01); C22C 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0799901 A1 19971008 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
  • [A] EP 0905266 A1 19990331 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
  • [X] B.E.CARLSON: "The Effect of Strain Rate and Temperature on the Deformation of Die Cast AM60B", SOC. AUTOMOT. ENG. SPEC. PUB. SP-1096, 1995, pages 33 - 41, XP000961539
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] GHOSH D ET AL: "DEVELOPMENT OF DUCTILE THIXOMOLDED MAGNESIUM ALLOYS", RECENT METALLURGICAL ADVANCES IN LIGHT METALS INDUSTRIES, XP002034402

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081243 A1 20010307; JP 2001073059 A 20010321; KR 20010030267 A 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI