Global Patent Index - EP 1081250 A1

EP 1081250 A1 2001-03-07 - Low phosphorus coolant composition

Title (en)

Low phosphorus coolant composition

Title (de)

Phosphorarme Kühlmittelzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition de refroidissement à basse teneur en phosphore

Publication

EP 1081250 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118606 A

Priority

JP 24821099 A

Abstract (en)

A glycol-based coolant composition which provides an excellent metal corrosion inhibition despite its low phosphorus content is disclosed. The glycol-based coolant composition contains: (A) 0.1-5.0 % by weight of at least one ingredient selected from group A' consisting of C6-C12 aliphatic dibasic acids and their alkali metal salts; (B) 0.1-10 % by weight of at least one ingredient selected from group B' consisting of alkyl benzoic acids and their alkali metal salts; (C) 0.001-0.1 % by weight of at least one ingredient selected from group C' consisting of strontium compounds and their alkali metal salts; and (D) 0.1-0.3 % by weight of at least one ingredient selected from group D' consisting of phosphoric acids and their alkali metal salts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 11/08; C09K 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 5/08 (2006.01); C09K 5/00 (2006.01); C09K 5/20 (2006.01); C23F 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/08 (2013.01); C09K 5/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081250 A1 20010307; EP 1081250 B1 20040623; DE 60011717 D1 20040729; DE 60011717 T2 20050707; JP 2001072967 A 20010321; JP 3941030 B2 20070704; US 6508951 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160902

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160815

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-04-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011717 P 20040729

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI