Global Patent Index - EP 1081252 A1

EP 1081252 A1 2001-03-07 - Selective plating method

Title (en)

Selective plating method

Title (de)

Verbessertes selektives Plattierungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de placage sélectif

Publication

EP 1081252 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202857 A

Priority

EP 99202857 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a process for providing objects with a metal plating. More specifically it relates to electrolytically plating of objects, which objects comprise areas that should be plated and areas that should not be plated. It has been found that the ratio between the thickness of the plating layer on the areas that should not be plated, and the areas that should be plated can be lowered by first plating both areas and then removing parts of the plated layers by stripping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 7/00; C25D 5/02; C25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2013.01); C25D 5/022 (2013.01); C25D 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081252 A1 20010307; WO 0116404 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034101

2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI