Global Patent Index - EP 1081259 A1

EP 1081259 A1 2001-03-07 - Apparatus controlling the air supply to the jet of an air intermingling device

Title (en)

Apparatus controlling the air supply to the jet of an air intermingling device

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Luftzufuhr zu den Düsen einer Luftverwirbelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'alimentation en air d'une buse d'un dispositif d'enchevêtrement de fils

Publication

EP 1081259 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117767 A

Priority

CH 159499 A

Abstract (en)

The system to control the air feed to the jets (2,2',2) of a pneumatic eddy appts. (V), where at least two yarns (E,F) are given a continuous eddy action with a twist imposed on them by the jets, has a valve (10) to control the air flow according to at least one bobbin winding parameter. At least one bobbin winding parameter includes the yarn movement speed, the bobbin dia., the bobbin weight or the length of the yarn (U) to be wound. The valve (10) is operated by a motor to control the vol. flow, and a sensor monitors the setting for the max. vol. flow. The valve has a valve slide, mounted to the motor axis. The valve drive is a step motor, and the setting for the max. vol. flow is defined by a given number of motor steps. The sensor is formed by a proximity switch. Using the yarn speed as a control parameter, the air flow is throttled on a slow yarn speed. Where the control parameter is the bobbin dia., the bobbin weight, or the length of yarn (U) to be wound, the air flow is throttled on low parameter values. The air flow has a continuous or stepped control.

Abstract (de)

Die Luftverwirbelungsvorrichtung (V) dient zur kontinuierlichen Verwirbelung von mindestens zwei Garnen (E, F), welchen in den Düsen (2, 2<IMAGE>, 2<IMAGE>) ein Drall aufgeprägt wird. Die Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Luftzufuhr enthält ein Ventil (10), welches Mittel zur Steuerung der Luftzufuhr in Abhängigkeit von mindestens einem Spulparameter aufweist. Der mindestens eine Spulparameter ist die Garngeschwindigkeit, der Spulendurchmesser, das Spulengewicht oder die Länge des aufgespulten Garns (U). Das Ventil (10) weist ein motorisch antreibbares Organ für die Regelung des Volumenstroms und einen Sensor für die Überwachung der dem maximalen Volumenstrom entsprechenden Stellung dieses Organs auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 1/08; D02G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 1/08 (2013.01); D02G 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • EP 99106310 A 19990326
  • EP 99109917 A 19990520

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081259 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080226

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI