Global Patent Index - EP 1081266 A2

EP 1081266 A2 2001-03-07 - Method and device for wet treatment, particularly washing of laundry

Title (en)

Method and device for wet treatment, particularly washing of laundry

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Nassbehandeln, insbesondere Waschen, von Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'humidification en particulier pour le lavage du linge

Publication

EP 1081266 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117242 A

Priority

  • DE 19941088 A
  • DE 19964359 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves treating wash items in a treatment liquid in a rotating drum (12), whereby the items pass longitudinally through the drum and the treatment liquid is passed in the opposite direction. Chambers (18) are formed in the drum and at least one chamber interrupts the flow of the liquid or can interrupt it. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for wet treatment, especially washing, of wash items.

Abstract (de)

Bei Durchlaufwaschmaschinen (10) wird die verwendete Behandlungsflüssigkeit zusammen mit den Wäschestücken (11) in Behandlungsrichtung (17) durch eine Trommel (12) geleitet, in der die Behandlung der Wäschestücke (11) stattfindet. Die Behandlungsflüssigkeit wird entlang der Trommel im Gegenstrom gegen die Behandlungsrichtung (17) zurückgeleitet. Das lässt einen gezielten Austausch der Behandlungsflüssigkeit im Verlauf der Trommel (12) nicht zu. Die erfindungsgemäße Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) verfügt über eine Trommel (12) mit aufeinanderfolgenden Kammern, wobei der Durchfluss der Behandlungsflüssigkeit durch mindestens eine Kammer unterbrochen werden kann. Dadurch ist es möglich, an gezielten Stellen der Trommel (12), nämlich in den Bereichen bestimmter Kammern, die Behandlungsflüssigkeit auszutauschen. Mit einer solchen Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) sind, ohne mechanische Veränderungen an der Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) vornehmen zu müssen, die Behandlungsabläufe veränderbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 29/00 (2006.01); D06F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941088 A1 20010301; DE 19941088 B4 20060601; DE 50012896 D1 20060720; EP 1081266 A2 20010307; EP 1081266 A3 20030212; EP 1081266 B1 20060607; ES 2265843 T3 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150815

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160926

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-05-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PHARMAGG SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH, 27318 HOYA, DE

- Document: DE 50012896

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012896

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012896

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012896

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110814

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110814

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100811

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2265843 T3

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012896 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WET TREATMENT, PARTICULARLY WASHING OF LAUNDRY

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI