Global patent index - EP 1081267 A2

EP 1081267 A2 2001-03-07 - Method and device for wet treatment, particulary washing of laundry

Title (en)

Method and device for wet treatment, particulary washing of laundry

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Nassbehandeln, insbesondere Waschen, von Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'humidification en particulier pour le lavage du linge

Publication

EP 1081267 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117243 A

Priority

DE 19941073 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves at least washing and rinsing items in different chambers (17-19) in a longitudinal sequence in a rotating drum (11). The items are washed in at least some chambers by rotating the drum in one direction and are ejected from the chambers by rotating it in the opposite direction. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for wet treatment, especially washing, of wash items.

Abstract (de)

Bei Durchlaufwaschmaschinen (10) mit aufeinanderfolgenden Behandlungskammern wird zum Waschen der Wäschestücke eine Waschkammer (17) schwenkend hin- und herbewegt. Zum Austrag der Wäschestücke aus der Waschkammer (17) erfolgt ein umlaufender Antrieb der Waschkammer (17) in eine bestimmte Richtung. Die Folge ist, dass entweder ein Austrag der Wäschestücke aus der Waschkammer (17) und jeder anderen Kammer der Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) nur zur gleichen Zeit erfolgen kann oder die einzelnen Kammern unabhängig voneinander angetrieben werden müssen. Die erfindungsgemäße Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) verfügt über Kammern, insbesondere Waschkammern (17), die über einen derart ausgebildeten Einbau (36) verfügen, dass die Wäschestücke sowohl durch schwenkenden Antrieb als auch umlaufenden Antrieb der Waschkammer (17) in einer bestimmten Drehrichtung gewaschen werden können. Durch einen umlaufenden Antrieb der Waschkammer (17) in entgegengesetzter Richtung ist ein Austrag der Wäschestücke aus der Waschkammer (17) möglich. Auf diese Weise können alle Kammern gleichermaßen angetrieben werden und auch miteinander verbunden sein, wobei während der Wäsche der Bekleidungsstücke in der Waschkammer (17) die Wäschestücke aus einer anderen Waschkammer (17) ausförderbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941073 A1 20010301; EP 1081267 A2 20010307; EP 1081267 A3 20030917

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20150303

2013-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050308

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI