Global Patent Index - EP 1081268 A2

EP 1081268 A2 2001-03-07 - Cover plate for domestic apparatus

Title (en)

Cover plate for domestic apparatus

Title (de)

Abdeckplatte für Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour appareils ménagers

Publication

EP 1081268 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116228 A

Priority

DE 19940145 A

Abstract (en)

The cover plate has a decorative part (1,2) and a strengthening body (3) with integrated functional elements (5). The strengthening body is of plate or box-shaped construction and is closed on its underside. The decorative part consists of a bearer (1) with a decorative layer (2) and a heat-setting layer Independent claims are also included for a method of manufacturing a cover plate and for uses of the plate on domestic dryers, washing machines and dishwashers

Abstract (de)

Abdeckplatte für Haushaltsgeräte, enthaltend ein Dekorteil und einen Verstärkungskörper mit integrierten, geformten Funktionselementen, wobei der Verstärkungskörper einen platten- oder kastenartigen Aufbau aufweist und an seiner Unterseite hin geschlossen ist. Das verwendete Dekorteil besteht vorzugsweise aus einem Träger, einer auf diesen Träger aufgebrachten Dekorschicht und einer auf der Dekorschicht liegenden hitzegehärteten Schicht, wobei als Trägermaterial ein thermoplastisches Polymer verwendet wird. Der Verstärkungskörper kann zusätzlich gerippt sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/12; A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 19/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/12 (2006.01); D06F 58/02 (2006.01); F24C 15/14 (2006.01); H05K 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4251 (2013.01); D06F 39/12 (2013.01); F24C 15/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/23 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24174 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24777 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940145 A1 20010301; CZ 20003084 A3 20011114; EP 1081268 A2 20010307; EP 1081268 A3 20030618; JP 2001137597 A 20010522; PL 342158 A1 20010226; TR 200002483 A2 20010321; US 7105218 B1 20060912

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100302

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLIOLEFINE ITALIA S.R.L.

2005-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMBH

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI