Global Patent Index - EP 1081273 A2

EP 1081273 A2 2001-03-07 - Floor covering with an electroconductive top layer

Title (en)

Floor covering with an electroconductive top layer

Title (de)

Bodenbelag mit einer elektrisch leitfähigen Oberschicht

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sol avec une couche supérieure électroconductrice

Publication

EP 1081273 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113845 A

Priority

DE 19941838 A

Abstract (en)

The electrically conductive elements (4) are guided through the bottom layer (3). The conductive elements (4) are nails or clips. The covering is fixed to a floor with a conductive adhesive via its bottom layer (3), and the conductive top layer (2) consists of a pile.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bodenbelag mit einer elektrisch leitfähigen Oberschicht (2) und einer elektrisch isolierenden Unterschicht (3) wird erfindungsgemäß mit elektrisch leitfähigen Elementen (4) versehen, die durch die Unterschicht bis zur Oberschicht hindurchgeführt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/00 (2006.01); H05F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05F 3/025 (2013.01); D06N 7/0068 (2013.01); D06N 7/0081 (2013.01); D06N 2209/041 (2013.01); D06N 2209/046 (2013.01); D06N 2211/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081273 A2 20010307; EP 1081273 A3 20031210; DE 19941838 A1 20010412; DE 19941838 C2 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060102

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06N 7/00 A

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05F 3/02 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI