Global Patent Index - EP 1081277 A2

EP 1081277 A2 2001-03-07 - Machine for production and/or treatment of a web

Title (en)

Machine for production and/or treatment of a web

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Behandlung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Machine pour production et/ou traitement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1081277 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111355 A

Priority

DE 19941334 A

Abstract (en)

Web drying station, has a heated unit within a sealed hood with an overpressure chamber and a sealing belt over the web and sieves in a recess at the heated unit periphery. The machine for the production and/or finishing of a paper or cardboard web (14) has at least one heated unit (10) especially as a press roller, drying cylinder and/or the like. Part of its circumference where the web (14) passes around it has at least one sieve (16,18) and an outer sealing belt (20). The assembly is shrouded by a hood (12) with its interior at an overpressure through a liquid or gas medium under pressure. The sealing belt (20) is wider than the paper/cardboard web (14). The sieves (16,18) project at both side edges, so that they are pressed with sealing against the surface of the heated unit (10) by the overpressure within the pressure chamber (22) of the shrouding hood (12) and/or the pressure chamber (22). The hood (12) is sealed against the ambient atmosphere by seals (24) at both end sides between an end wall (12') of the hood (12) and a radial counter wall (26), preferably in a cylinder shape. At least one cylinder counter wall (26) is in a zone at one end of the heated unit (10), formed by a disk or a shoulder at the bearing journals (30) of the heated unit (10). The end walls (12') of the hood (12) extend as far as the bearing journals (30). The web (14) and the sieves (16,18) are within a recess (28) in the peripheral surface of the heated unit (10). The sealing belt (20) is wider than the recess (28), with its edges overlapping both sides of the recess. The depth of the recess (28) is at least equal to the combined thickness of the web (14) and the sieves (16,18). At least one sealing pocket or chamber can be at the periphery of the heated unit (10) at each side of the sealing belt (20) to cover or face it, linked to the ambient atmosphere so that its internal pressure matches the ambient or atmospheric pressure. At least one end side of the heated unit (10) is of a heat resistant material. The seal (24) at the end wall (12') of the hood (12) is held in place by a spring. The overpressure zone (22) within the hood (12) is sealed by an external non-contact seal. The heated unit (10) is a substitute shoe press.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Behandlung einer Materialbahn (14) wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt wenigstens eine heizbare Einheit (10) wie insbesondere eine Preßwalze, einen Trockenzylinder und/oder dergleichen, die auf einem Teil ihres Außenumfangs von der Materialbahn (14), wenigstens einem Sieb (16, 18) und einem äußeren Dichtband (20) umschlungen ist, und eine die heizbare Einheit mit einem unter Druck stehenden flüssigen oder gasförmigen Medium beaufschlagende Überdruckhaube. Das Dichtband (20) ist breiter als die Materialbahn (14) und das Sieb (16, 18), wobei es mit seinen beiden seitlichen Randbereichen über diese hinausragt, so daß seine beiden Randbereiche durch den in der Druckkammer (22) der Überdruckhaube (12) vorherrschenden Überdruck dichtend an die Oberfläche der heizbaren Einheit (10) angepreßt werden. Alternativ oder zusätzlich kann vorgesehen sein, daß der Druckraum (22) der Überdruckhaube (12) an seinen beiden Stirnseiten jeweils durch eine Dichtung (24) nach außen abgedichtet ist, die zwischen einer Stirnwand (12') der feststehenden Überdruckhaube (12) und einer insbesondere radialen zylinderseitigen Gegenwand (26) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/00; D21F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/18 (2006.01); F26B 13/26 (2006.01); F26B 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2013.01); D21F 5/004 (2013.01); D21F 5/044 (2013.01); F26B 13/18 (2013.01); F26B 13/26 (2013.01); F26B 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19941334 A1 20010301; EP 1081277 A2 20010307; EP 1081277 A3 20010718; EP 1081277 B1 20041013; US 6397493 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110527

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008204

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008204 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030926

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI