Global Patent Index - EP 1081280 A2

EP 1081280 A2 2001-03-07 - Method and device for presetting a calender

Title (en)

Method and device for presetting a calender

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Voreinstellen eines Kalanders

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour préréglage d'une calandre

Publication

EP 1081280 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117498 A

Priority

DE 19940664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19940664C1] Gives a pilot setting for rollers of a calender. The internal support (15) for the lower roller (4) is subjected to pressure, and to close the nips (18,19), the external/ internal supports (13,4) for the lower roller (15) are subjected to an increasing pressure. The effective pressure at the outer and inner supports (11,13,15) is registered at the moment when the upper nip (18) is fully closed. The internal support (15) for the lower roller (4) is subjected to pressure so that the roller mantle (14) forms a cylinder around its horizontal axis. The pressure from one support (15) to the lower roller is followed by pressure from the other support (13). To close the upper nip (18), the pressure is reduced at the inner support (11) for the upper roller. The same pressure is applied to all the inner and outer support systems (11,13,15), and the pressure change is continued automatically until the point when the upper nip (18) is fully closed. The pressure change for the inner support (15) for the lower roller is set so that the ends of the mantle are at a constant gap from the roller carrier (12). Compensation is made for the overhanging weights, for at least one center roller (3). An Independent claim is included for a calender assembly with a measurement system (20,21) at least one end of the uppermost nip (18), to generate a signal when the nip (18) is closed. A unit which receives the signal is triggered to register the pressure at the supports (11,13,15). The measurement units (20,21) have an optical action, where a light chamber is interrupted when the nip (18) is closed. A control sets the pressure for the inner or outer supports (15) for the lower roller (4), to keep the ends of the mantle at a constant gap from the roller carrier (12).

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Voreinstellen eines Kalanders für Papier, Pappe u.dgl. weist einen Stapel (1) aus einer Unterwalze (4), mindestens einer Mittelwalze (3) und einer Oberwalze (2) auf. Die Unterwalze ist eine Biegeeinstellwalze mit Mantelhub, die Oberwalze eine Biegeeinstellwalze ohne Mantelhub. Die internen Stützvorrichtungen (15) der Unterwalze (2) werden mit Druck derart belastet, daß der Mantel (14) der Unterwalze etwa einen Zylinder mit horizontaler Achse bildet. Zum Schließen der Nips (18, 19) werden die externen Stützvorrichtungen (13) der Unterwalze oder deren internen Stützvorrichtungen (15) mit einem ansteigenden Druck belastet. Der den jeweils anderen Stützvorrichtungen (15) der Unterwalze zugeführte Druck wird dem Träger entsprechend nachgeführt. Die im Augenblick des vollständigen Schließens des obersten Nips (18) in den externen und internen Stützvorrichtungen (11, 13, 15) wirksamen Drücke werden registriert. Ein Kalander zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens weist im Bereich mindestens des einen Endes des obersten Nips (18) eine Meßvorrichtung (20, 21) auf, die beim Schließen dieses Nipendes ein Schließsignal (S) abgibt. Auf diese Weise ergibt sich eine sehr einfache Kalibrierung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940664 C1 20010208; EP 1081280 A2 20010307; EP 1081280 A3 20010711; EP 1081280 B1 20040310; US 6523465 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060812

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060812

2007-04-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060813

2006-08-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060812

2005-08-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005582 P 20040415

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI