Global Patent Index - EP 1081291 A3

EP 1081291 A3 2002-11-27 - Method for protecting basements against groundwater or infiltration water

Title (en)

Method for protecting basements against groundwater or infiltration water

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz von Kellerbauten gegen Grund- und Sickerwasser

Title (fr)

Méthode de protection de sous-sols contre l'eau phréatique ou l'eau d'infiltration

Publication

EP 1081291 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00118803 A

Priority

DE 19942415 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1081291A2] The method involves laying a granular sub-base (5), e.g. of sand, chips or high-resistance foam, onto the soil level and then an outer shell (4) for a base plate (7) is then formed on top. A rubber protection film (6) is fitted inside the shell to completely cover it and overlap it without leaks. A further granular sub-base may be laid over the rubber film and then a concrete base plate is laid. The side walls of the building or room are then erected. and the outsides of the walls are completely covered with rubber film in a trough-shaped form and sealed tightly on all sides as well as the upper edge of the masonry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 31/06; E02D 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/02 (2013.01); E02D 2250/0023 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081291 A2 20010307; EP 1081291 A3 20021127; DE 19942415 A1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02D 31/06 A, 7E 02D 31/02 B

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI